NC H73 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Ch. SL 2021-105
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Temporarily Waive ABC Permit Renewal Fees

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Temporarily Waive ABC Permit Renewal Fees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-08-04 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-07-22 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-16 Ch. SL 2021-105
2021-08-16 Signed by Gov. 8/16/2021
2021-08-06 Pres. To Gov. 8/6/2021
2021-08-05 Ratified
2021-08-04HouseOrdered Enrolled
2021-08-04HouseConf Report Adopted
2021-08-03HousePlaced On Cal For 08/04/2021
2021-08-03HouseCal Pursuant Rule 44(d)
2021-08-03HouseConf Com Reported
2021-07-22SenateConf Report Adopted
2021-07-22SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2021-07-22SenateConf Com Reported
2021-06-09SenateConf Com Appointed
2021-04-19HouseConf Com Appointed
2021-04-15HouseFailed Concur In S Com Sub
2021-04-15HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-04-15HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2021-04-14HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2021-04-14SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2021-04-13SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-04-13SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-04-12SenateReptd Fav
2021-04-01SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-04-01SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-04-01SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-03-25SenateRe-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-25SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-03-04SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-04SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-04SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2021-03-04HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2021-03-04HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-03-04HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-03-04HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-03-04HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-03-04HouseReptd Fav
2021-03-04HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-03-04HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-02-24HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2021-02-24HouseReptd Fav
2021-02-15HouseRef to the Com on Alcoholic Beverage Control, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-02-15HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-02-11HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18B903(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/H73
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H73v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H73v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H73v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H73v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H73v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H73v5.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/959/0/H73-PCS40143-TQf-3
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/2314/0/H73-PCS10235-TQ-14
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52543/0/H73-PCCS-NBC-9076
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52544/0/H73-PCCS30457-SA-4
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H73-SMSA-1(e1)-v-5
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H73-SMTQ-11(CSTQf-3)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H73-SMTQ-13(e2)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H73-SMTQ-28(CSTQ-14)-v-2
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/19
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/88
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/113
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/363
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/447

Bill Comments

feedback