NC H728 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-28 - Ch. SL 2016-117
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-28 - Ch. SL 2016-117
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Various Licensing Board Laws/Fees
Title
Amend Various Licensing Board Laws/Fees
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Conrad [R] | Sen. Robert Bryan [R] | Rep. Mitchell Setzer [R] | Rep. Nathan Baskerville [D] |
Rep. Patricia Cotham [R] | Rep. Susan Hamilton [D] | Rep. Michael Wray [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-07-01 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 89 N: 14 NV: 8 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-28 | Ch. SL 2016-117 | |
2016-07-28 | Signed by Gov. 7/28/2016 | |
2016-07-01 | Pres. To Gov. 7/1/2016 | |
2016-07-01 | Ratified | |
2016-07-01 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-07-01 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2016-07-01 | House | Added to Calendar |
2016-07-01 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-07-01 | House | Reptd Fav To Concur |
2016-06-30 | House | Ref To Com On Finance |
2016-06-30 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-30 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-29 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-29 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-29 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-23 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-04-23 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-15 | House | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Finance |
2015-04-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-14 | House | Filed |