NC H721 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-10 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-10 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Landlord/Tenant/Bed Bug Liability
Title
Landlord/Tenant/Bed Bug Liability
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-09 - House - Second Reading (Y: 105 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-10 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2011-06-10 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-10 | Rec From House | |
2011-06-09 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-09 | Placed On Cal For 6/9/2011 | |
2011-06-09 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-09 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-05-18 | Assigned To Commerce and Job Development Subcommittee on Business and Labor | |
2011-04-07 | Ref To Com On Commerce and Job Development | |
2011-04-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-06 | Filed |