NC H709 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-3)
Status: Passed on October 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-30 - Ch. SL 2015-298
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-3)
Status: Passed on October 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-30 - Ch. SL 2015-298
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
NCNG Tuition Assistance Benefit Amendment
Title
NCNG Tuition Assistance Benefit Amendment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-17 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-30 | Ch. SL 2015-298 | |
2015-10-30 | Signed by Gov. 10/30/2015 | |
2015-09-22 | Pres. To Gov. 9/22/2015 | |
2015-09-21 | Ratified | |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-09-16 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-09-15 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-09-15 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-07-22 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget |
2015-07-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-07-15 | Senate | Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget |
2015-07-15 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-28 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-27 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-27 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-27 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-27 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-21 | House | Re-ref Com On Education - Universities |
2015-04-21 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-15 | House | Ref to the Com on Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs, if favorable, Education - Universities |
2015-04-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-14 | House | Filed |