NC H706 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Ch. SL 2013-55
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Ch. SL 2013-55
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Preserve Landfill Space
Title
Preserve Landfill Space
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-07 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 104 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 104 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | Ch. SL 2013-55 | |
2013-05-17 | Signed by Gov. 5/17/2013 | |
2013-05-09 | Pres. To Gov. 5/9/2013 | |
2013-05-08 | Ratified | |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 05/07/2013 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-04-22 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-04-22 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-04-18 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/22/2013 |
2013-04-18 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-04-18 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-04-11 | House | Ref To Com On Environment |
2013-04-11 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-10 | House | Filed |