NC H70 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-01 - Ch. SL 2015-42
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-01 - Ch. SL 2015-42
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charlotte Firefighters' Retirement
Title
Charlotte Firefighters' Retirement
Sponsors
Sen. James Bishop [R] | Rep. John Bradford [R] | Rep. Kelly Alexander [D] | Sen. Robert Bryan [R] |
Rep. Charles Jeter [R] | Rep. Rodney Moore [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - A1 Bishop Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - A1 Bishop Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-01 | Ch. SL 2015-42 | |
2015-06-01 | Ratified | |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Ref To Com On Pensions & Retirement and Aging |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-01 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-03-31 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2015-03-31 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-03-31 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-03-31 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-03-30 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/31/2015 |
2015-03-30 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-03-30 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-24 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2015-03-24 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-02-12 | House | Ref to the Com on Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Appropriations |
2015-02-12 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-02-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S137 (Same As) 2015-03-09 - Re-ref Com On Pensions & Retirement and Aging