NC H686 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Ch. SL 2009-122
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Ch. SL 2009-122
Summary
Modernize Do Not Call Notice Procedures.
Title
Modernize Do Not Call Notice Procedures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Ch. SL 2009-122 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed By Gov. 6/19/2009 | |
2009-06-12 | Pres. To Gov. 6/12/2009 | |
2009-06-11 | Ratified | |
2009-06-10 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2009-06-09 | Placed On Cal For 6/10/2009 | |
2009-06-09 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-06-09 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2009-06-04 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-06-03 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-06-02 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-06-02 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-16 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2009-04-16 | Rec From House | |
2009-04-15 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-14 | Placed On Cal For 4/15/2009 | |
2009-04-14 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-04-14 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-01 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II | |
2009-04-01 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-23 | Ref to the Com on Public Utilities, if favorable, Judiciary II | |
2009-03-23 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-19 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H686 |