NC H683 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Indian Child Welfare Agreement Form

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Indian Child Welfare Agreement Form

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-27SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-04-27SenatePassed 1st Reading
2017-04-27SenateRegular Message Received From House
2017-04-27HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2017-04-26HousePassed 3rd Reading
2017-04-26HousePassed 2nd Reading
2017-04-26HouseAdded to Calendar
2017-04-26HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2017-04-26HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2017-04-11HouseRef To Com On Health
2017-04-11HousePassed 1st Reading
2017-04-10HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback