NC H679 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on October 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-20 - Ch. SL 2015-275
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on October 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-20 - Ch. SL 2015-275
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
UNC Self-Liquidating Projects
Title
UNC Self-Liquidating Projects
Sponsors
Rep. William Brawley [R] | Rep. Susan Martin [R] | Rep. John Szoka [R] | Rep. Kelly Hastings [R] |
Rep. Dean Arp [R] | Rep. Brian Brown [R] | Rep. Nelson Dollar [R] | Rep. Verla Insko [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-23 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 12 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-09-23 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - House - Third Reading (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-09-23 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - House - Third Reading (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-20 | Ch. SL 2015-275 | |
2015-10-20 | Signed by Gov. 10/20/2015 | |
2015-09-25 | Pres. To Gov. 9/25/2015 | |
2015-09-24 | Ratified | |
2015-09-23 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-09-23 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2015-09-23 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-09-23 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2015-09-23 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2015-09-23 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-09-22 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-09-21 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-09-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Ref To Com On Finance |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-06-18 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-06-18 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-06-17 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-06-16 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/17/2015 |
2015-06-16 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-06-16 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-06-03 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-06-03 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-14 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - Universities, if favorable, Finance |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-13 | House | Filed |