NC H678 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Ch. SL 2016-73
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Ch. SL 2016-73
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Innocence Commission Statutes
Title
Amend Innocence Commission Statutes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-28 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-06-24 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-06-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-06-24 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | Ch. SL 2016-73 | |
2016-06-30 | Signed by Gov. 6/30/2016 | |
2016-06-29 | Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2016 | |
2016-06-29 | Ratified | |
2016-06-28 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-06-28 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2016-06-27 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/28/2016 |
2016-06-27 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2016-06-27 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2016-06-24 | Engrossed | |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-07-29 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 08/05/2015 |
2015-07-29 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/29/2015 |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2015-04-30 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/29/2015 |
2015-04-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-28 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2015-04-28 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-14 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary I, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-13 | House | Filed |