NC H674 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Enrolled on July 1 2022 - 75% progression
Action: 2022-07-01 - Pres. To Gov. 7/1/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Require DNA Various Convict'ns/Other Matters

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require DNA Various Convict'ns/Other Matters

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-07-01 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-07-01 Pres. To Gov. 7/1/2022
2022-07-01 Ratified
2022-07-01HouseOrdered Enrolled
2022-07-01HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2022-06-30HousePlaced On Cal For 07/01/2022
2022-06-30HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2022-06-30HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2022-06-30SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2022-06-30SenateEngrossed
2022-06-30SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2022-06-30SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2022-06-30SenateAmend Adopted A3
2022-06-30SenateAmend Adopted A2
2022-06-30SenateAmend Adopted A1
2022-06-29SenateReptd Fav
2022-06-21SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2022-06-21SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2022-06-21SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2022-06-13SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2022-06-13SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-05-10SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-10SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-05-10SenateRegular Message Received From House
2021-05-07HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-05-06HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-05-06HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-05-05HousePlaced On Cal For 05/06/2021
2021-05-05HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-05-05HouseReptd Fav
2021-05-04HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-05-04HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-05-04HouseRe-ref to the Com on Judiciary 2, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-05-04HouseWithdrawn From Com
2021-05-03HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-05-03HouseWithdrawn From Com
2021-05-03HouseSerial Referral To Appropriations Stricken
2021-04-27HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary 2, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-04-27HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-04-22HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105228.37(n/a)Citation Text
131E91(n/a)Citation Text
143B1200(n/a)Citation Text
15A(n/a)Citation Text
15A266.4(n/a)Citation Text
16122(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/H674
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H674v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H674v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H674v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H674v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H674v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H674v5.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/51185/0/H674-PCS40529-CH-14
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/54845/0/H674-PCS30588-CE-34
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/55177/0/H674-ACE-67-V-1
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/55196/0/H674-ACC-10-V-2
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/55197/0/H674-ACC-9-V-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H674-SMCH-32(CSCH-14)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H674-SMCE-124(CSCE-34)-v-4
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H674-SMCE-125(e2)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H674-SMCE-129(e3)-v-2
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/227
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/663
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/662
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/661
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/660
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/731

Bill Comments

feedback