NC H670 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Ch. Res 2015-10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Ch. Res 2015-10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honor Dean E. Smith
Title
Honor Dean E. Smith
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-11 | Ch. Res 2015-10 | |
2015-06-11 | Ratified | |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2015-06-10 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2015-06-10 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-06-10 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-06-08 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/10/2015 |
2015-06-08 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-06-08 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-14 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-13 | House | Filed |