NC H67 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on August 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-07 - Ch. SL 2009-456
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on August 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-07 - Ch. SL 2009-456
Summary
License Plate Frame/State Name Visible/Study.
Title
License Plate Frame/State Name Visible/Study.
Sponsors
Rep. Martha Alexander [D] | Rep. Nelson Cole [D] | Rep. Jerry Dockham [R] | Rep. Daniel Goforth [D] |
Rep. Mary Harrison [D] | Rep. Patricia Hurley [R] | Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] | Rep. David Martin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-07 | Ch. SL 2009-456 | |
2009-08-07 | Signed By Gov. 8/7/2009 | |
2009-07-31 | Pres. To Gov. 7/31/2009 | |
2009-07-30 | Ratified | |
2009-07-29 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2009-07-29 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2009-07-28 | Placed On Cal For 7/29/2009 | |
2009-07-28 | Conf Com Reported | |
2009-07-28 | Placed On Cal For 7/29/2009 | |
2009-07-28 | Conf Com Reported | |
2009-07-22 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2009-07-16 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2009-07-16 | Failed Concur In Com Sub | |
2009-07-15 | Placed On Cal For 7/16/2009 | |
2009-07-15 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-15 | Reptd Unfav For Conc | |
2009-07-09 | Ref To Com On Transportation | |
2009-07-09 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2009-07-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-02 | Placed On Cal For 7/7/2009 | |
2009-07-02 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-07-02 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-06-23 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-06-23 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-04-20 | Ref To Com On Transportation | |
2009-04-20 | Rec From House | |
2009-04-16 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-15 | Placed On Cal For 4/16/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-04-15 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-03-19 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III | |
2009-03-19 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-02-12 | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Judiciary III | |
2009-02-12 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-02-05 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2009-02-05 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-02-04 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H67 |