NC H658 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-11 - Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Commerce and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-11 - Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Commerce and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Telecommunications Carriers Amendment
Title
Telecommunications Carriers Amendment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-11 | Senate | Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2023-05-03 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2023-05-03 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-05-03 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-05-03 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-05-03 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-05-03 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-05-01 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-05-01 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-04-18 | House | Ref to the Com on Energy and Public Utilities, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-04-18 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-17 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Commerce; Commissions; Corporations
For-profit; Infrastructure; Public; Radio; Telecommunications; Utilities; Utilities Comn.
For-profit; Infrastructure; Public; Radio; Telecommunications; Utilities; Utilities Comn.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
62 | 30.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text |