NC H657 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-24 - Conf Com Appointed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-24 - Conf Com Appointed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Math Standard Course of Study Revisions
Title
Math Standard Course of Study Revisions
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Elmore [R] | Rep. Julia Howard [R] | Rep. George Cleveland [R] | Rep. Jonathan Jordan [R] |
Rep. Larry Pittman [R] | Rep. Harry Warren [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-22 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Amendment 6 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Amendment 5 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Amendment 6 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Amendment 5 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-24 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2016-06-22 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2016-06-22 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2016-06-21 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/22/2016 |
2016-06-21 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2016-06-20 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2016-06-16 | Engrossed | |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Amend Adopted A6 |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Amend Adopted A5 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/16/2016 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Reconsidered 3rd Reading |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Amend Adopted A4 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Amend Adopted A3 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Amend Adopted A2 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/15/2016 |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/13/2016 |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Education/Higher Education |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-22 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-21 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-21 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-21 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-21 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-21 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-14 | House | Ref To Com On Education - Universities |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-13 | House | Filed |