NC H647 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-12)
Status: Passed on October 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-20 - Ch. SL 2015-274
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-12)
Status: Passed on October 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-20 - Ch. SL 2015-274
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Epi Pens in All Child-Serving Businesses
Title
Epi Pens in All Child-Serving Businesses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-29 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-20 | Ch. SL 2015-274 | |
2015-10-20 | Signed by Gov. 10/20/2015 | |
2015-09-30 | Pres. To Gov. 9/30/2015 | |
2015-09-29 | Ratified | |
2015-09-29 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-09-29 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2015-09-29 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-09-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-09-29 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-21 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-20 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-20 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-20 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-20 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-20 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-14 | House | Ref To Com On Health |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-13 | House | Filed |