NC H645 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-30 - Ref to the Com on Judiciary II, if favorable, Finance
Pending: House Judiciary II Committee
Status: Introduced on March 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-30 - Ref to the Com on Judiciary II, if favorable, Finance
Pending: House Judiciary II Committee
Summary
Annexation/Meaningful Services and Oversight.
Title
Annexation/Meaningful Services and Oversight.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-30 | Ref to the Com on Judiciary II, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-03-30 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-03-18 | Ref to the Com on Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House, if favorable, Judiciary II, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-03-18 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-17 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S494 (Same As) 2011-04-04 - Ref To Com On Finance
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H645 |