NC H64 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-20 - Re-ref to the Com on Elections and Ethics Law, if favorable, State and Local Government II
Pending: House Elections and Ethics Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-20 - Re-ref to the Com on Elections and Ethics Law, if favorable, State and Local Government II
Pending: House Elections and Ethics Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Municipal Elections in Even-Numbered Years
Title
Municipal Elections in Even-Numbered Years
Sponsors
Rep. Harry Warren [R] | Rep. Debra Conrad [R] | Rep. Bert Jones [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Collins [R] |
Rep. Beverly Boswell [R] | Rep. Mark Brody [R] | Rep. George Cleveland [R] | Sen. Carl Ford [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-20 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Elections and Ethics Law, if favorable, State and Local Government II |
2017-02-20 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-02-09 | House | Ref to the Com on State and Local Government II, if favorable, Elections and Ethics Law |
2017-02-09 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S206 (Same As) 2017-03-22 - Re-ref to Select Committee on Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate