NC H615 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-13 - Re-ref to the Com on Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-13 - Re-ref to the Com on Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
NC Consumer Fireworks Safety Act
Title
NC Consumer Fireworks Safety Act
Sponsors
Rep. John Szoka [R] | Rep. Mark Brody [R] | Rep. Jonathan Hardister [R] | Rep. Michael Wray [D] |
Rep. Howard Hunter [D] | Rep. Brenden Jones [R] | Rep. Garland Pierce [D] | Rep. Shelly Willingham [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-06-13 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-08 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-08 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S566 (Same As) 2019-04-03 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H615 |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H615v0.pdf |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H615v1.pdf |