NC H613 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-14 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-14 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarify Signs on Highways and Roads
Title
Clarify Signs on Highways and Roads
Sponsors
Rep. William Brawley [R] | Rep. Elmer Floyd [D] | Rep. John Bradford [R] | Rep. John Fraley [R] |
Rep. Larry Hall [D] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-23 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-14 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-07-14 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/14/2015 |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Re-ref Com On State and Local Government |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-23 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-23 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-23 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-23 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-23 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-23 | House | Re-ref Com On Elections |
2015-04-23 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-13 | House | Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Elections |
2015-04-13 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-09 | House | Filed |