NC H602 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-13 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Status: Introduced on March 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-13 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Summary
Mental Health Services Funds.
Title
Mental Health Services Funds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-13 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2009-05-13 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-16 | Ref to the Com on Mental Health Reform, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2009-03-16 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S517 (Same As) 2012-06-26 - Re-assigned To Judiciary Subcommittee B
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H602 |