NC H593 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Ch. SL 2020-83
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

JCPC/Detention/CAA and Other Fees

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JCPC/Detention/CAA and Other Fees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-25 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-01 Ch. SL 2020-83
2020-07-01 Signed by Gov. 7/1/2020
2020-06-26 Pres. To Gov. 6/26/2020
2020-06-26 Ratified
2020-06-26HouseOrdered Enrolled
2020-06-25SenateConf Report Adopted
2020-06-25HouseConf Report Adopted
2020-06-25HouseAdded to Calendar
2020-06-25HouseConf Com Reported
2020-06-25SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2020-06-25SenateConf Com Reported
2020-06-25SenateConf Com Appointed
2020-06-25HouseConf Com Appointed
2020-06-25HouseFailed Concur In S Com Sub
2020-06-24HousePlaced On Cal For 06/25/2020
2020-06-24HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2020-06-24HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2020-06-24SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2020-06-24SenateEngrossed
2020-06-24SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2020-06-24SenateAmend Adopted A2
2020-06-24SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2020-06-24SenateAmend Adopted A1
2020-06-24SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2020-06-24SenateReptd Fav
2020-06-23SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-06-23SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2020-06-23SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2020-06-22SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-06-22SenateWithdrawn From Com
2020-06-19SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-06-19SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2020-06-19SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2020-06-18SenateRe-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-06-18SenateWithdrawn From Com
2020-06-18SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-06-18SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2020-06-18SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2020-06-16SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-06-16SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-17SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-17SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-17SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-04-17HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-16HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-16HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-16HouseAdded to Calendar
2019-04-16HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-16HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-15HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-15HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-08HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-08HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-03HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H593
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H593v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H593v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H593v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H593v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H593v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H593v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H593v6.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H593v7.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/181
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/849
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/850
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/845
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/844
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/872
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/1059
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/1038

Bill Comments

feedback