NC H589 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-25 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-25 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Protect Whistleblower LEOs from Retaliation
Title
Protect Whistleblower LEOs from Retaliation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-25 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-04-25 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-04-10 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary 3, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-04-10 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S534 (Same As) 2023-04-05 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17C | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
17C | 17 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
17E | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
17E | 17 | (n/a) | Citation Text |