NC H581 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-26 - Failed 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-26 - Failed 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revisions to Outdoor Advertising Laws
Title
Revisions to Outdoor Advertising Laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 66 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-06-26 - House - A6 Turner, B. Second Reading (Y: 53 N: 61 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-06-26 - House - A5 Lewis Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - A4 Lewis Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - A3 Davis Second Reading (Y: 56 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-06-26 - House - A2 Martin, G. Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 72 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-06-26 - House - A1 Arp Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - A6 Turner, B. Second Reading (Y: 53 N: 61 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-06-26 - House - A5 Lewis Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - A4 Lewis Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - A3 Davis Second Reading (Y: 56 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-06-26 - House - A2 Martin, G. Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 72 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-06-26 - House - A1 Arp Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-26 | House | Failed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-26 | House | Amend Failed A6 |
2017-06-26 | House | Amend Adopted A5 |
2017-06-26 | House | Amend Adopted A4 |
2017-06-26 | House | Amend Failed A3 |
2017-06-26 | House | Amend Failed A2 |
2017-06-26 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-06-22 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/26/2017 |
2017-06-22 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-06-22 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-06-19 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-06-19 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-06-14 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-06-14 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2017-06-13 | House | Re-ref Com On Regulatory Reform |
2017-06-13 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-06-07 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-06-07 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-06-06 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/07/2017 |
2017-06-06 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-06-06 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-05-26 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-05-26 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-05-23 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-05-23 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-04-11 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2017-04-11 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-06 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-05 | House | Filed |