NC H58 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-17 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Honor Douglas Yongue, Former Member

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Honor Douglas Yongue, Former Member

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-17SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-02-17SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-02-17SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2021-02-17HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2021-02-17HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-02-17HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-02-16HousePlaced On Cal For 02/17/2021
2021-02-16HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-02-16HouseReptd Fav
2021-02-09HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-02-09HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-02-04HouseFiled

Subjects


North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback