NC H58 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-16 - Ch. SL 2011-155
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-16 - Ch. SL 2011-155
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Comm. Colleges/Opt Out of Fed'l Loan Program
Title
Comm. Colleges/Opt Out of Fed'l Loan Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-16 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 75 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - Third Reading\M4 Previous\Question (Y: 67 N: 49 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - Second Reading (Y: 76 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - Second Reading\M4 Previous\Question (Y: 70 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - Third Reading\M4 Previous\Question (Y: 67 N: 49 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - Second Reading (Y: 76 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - Second Reading\M4 Previous\Question (Y: 70 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-16 | Ch. SL 2011-155 | |
2011-06-16 | Ratified | |
2011-06-16 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2011-06-15 | Placed On Cal For 6/15/2011 | |
2011-06-15 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-15 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2011-06-14 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-14 | Placed On Cal For 6/14/2011 | |
2011-06-14 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-06-14 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-06-09 | Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education | |
2011-06-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-09 | Rec From House | |
2011-06-08 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-07 | Placed On Cal For 6/8/2011 | |
2011-06-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-02-09 | Ref To Com On Education | |
2011-02-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-02-08 | Filed |