NC H574 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-26 - Re-ref Com On Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs
Pending: House Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-26 - Re-ref Com On Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs
Pending: House Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Wind Energy/Consistency With Military
Title
Wind Energy/Consistency With Military
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | House | Re-ref Com On Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs |
2017-04-26 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-04-19 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Added |
2017-04-06 | House | Ref to the Com on Energy and Public Utilities, if favorable, Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-05 | House | Filed |