NC H573 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-19 - Ch. SL 2014-14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-19 - Ch. SL 2014-14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Stormwater Management Fee Uses
Title
Stormwater Management Fee Uses
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Jeter [R] | Rep. Ruth Samuelson [R] | Rep. Rodney Moore [D] | Rep. Susan Martin [R] |
Rep. Kenneth Waddell [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Ch. SL 2014-14 | |
2014-06-19 | Signed by Gov. 6/19/2014 | |
2014-06-13 | Pres. To Gov. 6/13/2014 | |
2014-06-12 | Ratified | |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Ref To Com On Finance |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-05-14 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-14 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-14 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/14/2013 |
2013-05-14 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-05-14 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-04-04 | House | Ref To Com On Finance |
2013-04-04 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S275 (Same As) 2013-03-13 - Ref To Com On Finance