NC H570 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-03 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-03 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Efficient Government Buildings & Savings Act
Title
Efficient Government Buildings & Savings Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-05-03 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-05-01 | House | Re-ref to the Com on State Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-05-01 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-04-06 | House | Ref to the Com on Energy and Public Utilities, if favorable, State Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-04-06 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
143 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
143 | 135.36 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143 | 135.37 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143 | 64.11 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143 | 64.12 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143 | 64.12A | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143 | 64.17 | (n/a) | Citation Text |