NC H551 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-04 - Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-04 - Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
DOT Sales of Unused Property
Title
DOT Sales of Unused Property
Sponsors
Rep. William Brawley [R] | Rep. Francis Iler [R] | Rep. James Adams [R] | Sen. James Bishop [R] |
Rep. John Faircloth [R] | Rep. John Fraley [R] | Rep. Larry Pittman [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | Senate | Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Finance |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-16 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-15 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-15 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-15 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-14 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary IV |
2015-04-14 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-06 | House | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Judiciary IV |
2015-04-06 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-02 | House | Filed |