NC H550 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-8)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Ch. SL 2017-140
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Establish New Nurse Licensure Compact

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish New Nurse Licensure Compact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-20 Ch. SL 2017-140
2017-07-20 Signed by Gov. 7/20/2017
2017-06-29 Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2017
2017-06-29 Ratified
2017-06-28SenateOrdered Enrolled
2017-06-28SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2017-06-28SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2017-06-28SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2017-06-28SenateReptd Fav
2017-04-25SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-04-25SenatePassed 1st Reading
2017-04-25SenateRegular Message Received From House
2017-04-25HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2017-04-24HousePassed 3rd Reading
2017-04-24HousePassed 2nd Reading
2017-04-21HousePlaced On Cal For 04/24/2017
2017-04-20HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2017-04-20HouseReptd Fav
2017-04-06HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2017-04-06HouseReptd Fav
2017-04-05HouseRef to the Com on Health, if favorable, Finance
2017-04-05HousePassed 1st Reading
2017-04-04HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H338 (Same As) 2017-03-15 - Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Finance

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback