NC H536 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Law Enforcement Duty to Intervene

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law Enforcement Duty to Intervene

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-06SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-06SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-05-06SenateRegular Message Received From House
2021-05-06HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-05-05HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-05-05HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-05-04HousePlaced On Cal For 05/05/2021
2021-05-04HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-05-04HouseReptd Fav
2021-05-04HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-05-04HouseReptd Fav
2021-04-14HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary 2, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-04-14HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-04-13HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15A(n/a)Citation Text
15A401(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback