NC H520 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Ch. SL 2017-63
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Ch. SL 2017-63
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Union Co. Bd. of Ed/Partisan Election
Title
Union Co. Bd. of Ed/Partisan Election
Sponsors
Rep. Dean Arp [R] | Rep. Mark Brody [R] | Rep. Dwight Horn [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 73 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 73 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | Ch. SL 2017-63 | |
2017-06-28 | Ratified | |
2017-06-27 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-27 | House | Concurred In S Amend SA1 |
2017-06-26 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/27/2017 |
2017-06-26 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2017-06-26 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Amend |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/26/2017 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Re-ref to Select Committee on Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-11 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-06 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/10/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-05 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-05 | House | Re-ref Com On Elections and Ethics Law |
2017-04-05 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-30 | House | Ref to the Com on State and Local Government I, if favorable, Elections and Ethics Law |
2017-03-30 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-29 | House | Filed |