NC H507 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-15 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-15 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Land-Use Regulatory Changes
Title
Land-Use Regulatory Changes
Sponsors
Rep. Jonathan Jordan [R] | Rep. John Bell [R] | Rep. Debra Conrad [R] | Rep. William Richardson [D] |
Rep. Scott Stone [R] | Rep. Michael Wray [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - A1 Jordan Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - A1 Jordan Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-15 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/15/2018 |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-21 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-20 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-20 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/20/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-19 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-04-11 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III |
2017-04-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-29 | House | Ref to the Com on Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Judiciary III |
2017-03-29 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S575 (Same As) 2017-04-03 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate