NC H488 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-14 - Ch. SL 2013-50
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-14 - Ch. SL 2013-50
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Regionalization of Public Utilities
Title
Regionalization of Public Utilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-01 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 76 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - Motion 6 - Postpone to certain day THIRD READING (Y: 16 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 39 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 68 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - A1 Stam Second Reading (Y: 104 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - Motion 6 - Postpone to certain day THIRD READING (Y: 16 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 39 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 68 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - A1 Stam Second Reading (Y: 104 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-14 | Ch. SL 2013-50 | |
2013-05-14 | Became Law w/o Signature | |
2013-05-03 | Pres. To Gov. 5/3/2013 | |
2013-05-02 | Ratified | |
2013-05-01 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-05-01 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2013-05-01 | House | Added to Calendar |
2013-04-30 | House | Rec To Concur S Com Sub |
2013-04-30 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-04-29 | Engrossed | |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Amend Adopted A2 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On Finance |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-04-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-04-11 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2013-04-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-04-11 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2013-04-09 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/10/2013 |
2013-04-09 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-04-09 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-04-02 | House | Ref To Com On Finance |
2013-04-02 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-28 | House | Filed |