NC H485 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 36-10)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-13 - Assigned To Commerce and Job Development Subcommittee on Business and Labor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-13 - Assigned To Commerce and Job Development Subcommittee on Business and Labor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
New Home Purchase Stimulus
Title
New Home Purchase Stimulus
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | Assigned To Commerce and Job Development Subcommittee on Business and Labor | |
2011-03-29 | Ref to the Com on Commerce and Job Development, if favorable, Finance | |
2011-03-29 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-25 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S476 (Same As) 2011-03-31 - Ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget