NC H482 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on August 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-09-29 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-09-29 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Employee Misclassification Reform
Title
Employee Misclassification Reform
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Pendleton [R] | Rep. John Blust [R] | Rep. John Szoka [R] | Sen. James Bishop [R] |
Rep. Larry Pittman [R] | Rep. Brian Turner [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-17 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-09-17 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 14 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-08-13 - House - Third Reading (Y: 90 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-08-12 - House - Second Reading (Y: 93 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-08-12 - House - A1 Hager Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-09-17 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 14 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-08-13 - House - Third Reading (Y: 90 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-08-12 - House - Second Reading (Y: 93 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-08-12 - House - A1 Hager Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-29 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-09-29 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-09-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 09/29/2015 |
2015-09-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-09-28 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-09-17 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-09-17 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Amend Failed A1 |
2015-09-16 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-09-16 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-09-15 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-09-15 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-09-15 | Senate | Withdrawn From Senate Clerk's Office |
2015-08-18 | Senate | Held in Senate Clerk's Office |
2015-08-17 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-08-13 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-08-13 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-08-12 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2015-08-12 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-08-12 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-08-11 | House | Placed On Cal For 08/12/2015 |
2015-08-10 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-08-10 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-08-06 | House | Placed On Cal For 08/10/2015 |
2015-08-06 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-08-05 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-08-05 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-08-04 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2015-08-04 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2015-06-30 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Added |
2015-06-30 | House | Serial Referral To Appropriations Added |
2015-06-17 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II |
2015-06-17 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-02 | House | Ref to the Com on Commerce and Job Development, if favorable, Judiciary II |
2015-04-02 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-01 | House | Filed |