NC H456 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-22 - Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-22 - Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarify Weight Limits/Ag. Vehicles
Title
Clarify Weight Limits/Ag. Vehicles
Sponsors
Rep. Rena Turner [R] | Rep. James Dixon [R] | Rep. Elmer Floyd [D] | Rep. John Fraley [R] |
Rep. Patricia Hurley [R] | Rep. Susan Martin [R] | Rep. Allen McNeill [R] | Rep. Larry Pittman [R] |
Rep. Harry Warren [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | Senate | Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Transportation |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-22 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-21 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-21 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-21 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-21 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-21 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-02 | House | Ref To Com On Transportation |
2015-04-02 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-01 | House | Filed |