NC H451 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-11)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-16 - Ref To Com On Health Care
Pending: Senate Health Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-16 - Ref To Com On Health Care
Pending: Senate Health Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
LRC/Study Suicide Prevention
Title
LRC/Study Suicide Prevention
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On Health Care |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2016-06-16 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2016-06-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-09 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/15/2016 |
2016-06-09 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2016-06-06 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-06 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2016-06-02 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/06/2016 |
2016-06-02 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-02 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-02 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-04-02 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-31 | House | Filed |