NC H449 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Ch. SL 2017-21
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Ch. SL 2017-21
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Henderson Cty/Law Enforcement Training Center
Title
Henderson Cty/Law Enforcement Training Center
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Ch. SL 2017-21 | |
2017-05-30 | Ratified | |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-06 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/06/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-05 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-04 | House | Re-ref Com On Education - Community Colleges |
2017-04-04 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-23 | House | Ref to the Com on State and Local Government I, if favorable, Education - Community Colleges |
2017-03-23 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-22 | House | Filed |