NC H429 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-30 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-30 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Med. Mal. Health Care Provider Defin
Title
Amend Med. Mal. Health Care Provider Defin
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-30 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-29 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-29 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-29 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-16 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-04-16 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-04-16 | House | Postponed To 04/22/2015 |
2015-04-16 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-04-15 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/16/2015 |
2015-04-15 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-15 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-02 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III |
2015-04-02 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-01 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary I |
2015-04-01 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-31 | House | Filed |