NC H392 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-29 - Ch. SL 2016-47
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-29 - Ch. SL 2016-47
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Fayetteville Charter/PWC Changes
Title
Fayetteville Charter/PWC Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-28 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-29 | Ch. SL 2016-47 | |
2016-06-29 | Ratified | |
2016-06-28 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-06-28 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2016-06-27 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/28/2016 |
2016-06-27 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2016-06-27 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-07-20 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary I. If fav, re-ref to Finance |
2015-07-20 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-29 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-28 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-28 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-28 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-28 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2015-04-16 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-04-16 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-03-31 | House | Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Finance |
2015-03-31 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-30 | House | Filed |