NC H384 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-12 - Ch. SL 2013-103
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-12 - Ch. SL 2013-103
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Definitions/Property Classif./Equ. Dist
Title
Amend Definitions/Property Classif./Equ. Dist
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-05 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - A1 Stevens Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - A1 Stevens Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-12 | Ch. SL 2013-103 | |
2013-06-12 | Signed by Gov. 6/12/2013 | |
2013-06-07 | Pres. To Gov. 6/7/2013 | |
2013-06-06 | Ratified | |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Ref To Com On Judiciary I |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-04-04 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2013-04-04 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-04-04 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-04-04 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2013-04-03 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/04/2013 |
2013-04-03 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-04-03 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-03-21 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee C |
2013-03-21 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-20 | House | Filed |