NC H384 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-23 - Ch. SL 2009-155
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-23 - Ch. SL 2009-155
Summary
Fuquay-Varina Quick Take.
Title
Fuquay-Varina Quick Take.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Stam [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-23 | Ch. SL 2009-155 | |
2009-06-23 | Ratified | |
2009-06-22 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-06-18 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-06-17 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-28 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2009-04-28 | Rec From House | |
2009-04-27 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-23 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-04-22 | Placed On Cal For 4/23/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-04-22 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-07 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-04-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-18 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-03-18 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-04 | Ref to the Com on Local Government II, if favorable, Judiciary I, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-03-04 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-03 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H384 |