NC H38 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on August 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-08-19 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-08-19 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Judicial Efficiency/Effect. Admin. of Justice
Title
Judicial Efficiency/Effect. Admin. of Justice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-08-18 - House - Third Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-08-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-08-13 - House - A1 Stevens Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-08-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-08-13 - House - A1 Stevens Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-19 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-08-19 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-08-18 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-08-13 | House | Placed On Cal For 08/18/2015 |
2015-08-13 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2015-08-13 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-08-13 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-08-12 | House | Placed On Cal For 08/13/2015 |
2015-08-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-08-11 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2015-07-22 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-07-22 | House | Rule 38b |
2015-07-22 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-06-09 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-06-09 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-04 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2015-03-04 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-02-04 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary II, if favorable, Appropriations |
2015-02-04 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-02-03 | House | Filed |