NC H364 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-14 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-14 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Treas. Debt Issuance Accountability/PED Stdy
Title
Treas. Debt Issuance Accountability/PED Stdy
Sponsors
Rep. Charles McGrady [R] | Sen. Timothy Moffitt [R] | Rep. Rayne Brown [R] | Rep. Thomas Murry [R] |
Rep. Dana Bumgardner [R] | Rep. Susan Martin [R] | Rep. John Szoka [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-14 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-05-13 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-13 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-13 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/13/2013 |
2013-05-13 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-05-13 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-05-08 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2013-05-08 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-03-21 | House | Ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Appropriations |
2013-03-21 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-20 | House | Filed |