NC H36 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Passed on February 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Ch. Res 2019-2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Invite Governor/State of State

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Invite Governor/State of State

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - House - M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 1 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13HouseCh. Res 2019-2
2019-02-13 Ratified
2019-02-13HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-02-13HouseConcurred In S Amend SA1
2019-02-11HousePlaced On Cal For 02/13/2019
2019-02-11HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Amend
2019-02-11SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-02-11SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-02-11SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-02-11SenateAmend Adopted A1
2019-02-07SenatePlaced On Cal For 02/11/2019
2019-02-07SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-02-06SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-02-06SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-06SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2019-02-06HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2019-02-06HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-02-06HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-02-06HouseAdded to Calendar
2019-02-06HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-06HouseRules Suspended
2019-02-06HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback