NC H36 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-6)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

NC IOM Study of Eye Care Access

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NC IOM Study of Eye Care Access

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-27SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-04-27SenatePassed 1st Reading
2017-04-27SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2017-04-27HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2017-04-27HousePassed 3rd Reading
2017-04-27HousePassed 2nd Reading
2017-04-27HouseAdded to Calendar
2017-04-27HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2017-04-27HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2017-04-26HouseSerial Referral To Appropriations Stricken
2017-04-26HouseSerial Referral To Insurance Stricken
2017-02-02HouseRef to the Com on Health, if favorable, Insurance, if favorable, Appropriations
2017-02-02HousePassed 1st Reading
2017-02-01HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback