NC H36 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-1)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Ch. SL 2011-263
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-1)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Ch. SL 2011-263
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Employers & Local Gov't Must Use E-Verify
Title
Employers & Local Gov't Must Use E-Verify
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-18 - House - C Rpt Adopt (Y: 67 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-06-18 - House - C Rpt Adopt\M4 Previous\Question (Y: 66 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-06-17 - Senate - Conference Rpt\Motion 8\To Adopt (Y: 40 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 71 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 43 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - A3 Faison\Third Reading\M3 To Lay On\The Table (Y: 64 N: 51 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - A2 Cleveland\Third Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - A1 Cleveland\Third Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 75 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-18 - House - C Rpt Adopt\M4 Previous\Question (Y: 66 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-06-17 - Senate - Conference Rpt\Motion 8\To Adopt (Y: 40 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 71 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 43 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - A3 Faison\Third Reading\M3 To Lay On\The Table (Y: 64 N: 51 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - A2 Cleveland\Third Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - A1 Cleveland\Third Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 75 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-23 | Ch. SL 2011-263 | |
2011-06-23 | Signed By Gov. 6/23/2011 | |
2011-06-20 | Pres. To Gov. 6/20/2011 | |
2011-06-18 | Ratified | |
2011-06-18 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2011-06-17 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2011-06-17 | Placed On Cal For 6/17/2011 | |
2011-06-17 | Conf Com Reported | |
2011-06-17 | Placed On Cal For 6/18/2011 | |
2011-06-17 | Conf Com Reported | |
2011-06-17 | Conf Rpt Rtn To Conf Com | |
2011-06-17 | Conf Rpt Recon/Withdrawn | |
2011-06-16 | Placed On Cal For 6/17/2011 | |
2011-06-16 | Conf Com Reported | |
2011-06-16 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2011-06-16 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2011-06-16 | Failed concur in S/Com Sub | |
2011-06-15 | Placed On Cal For 6/15/2011 | |
2011-06-15 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-15 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2011-06-14 | Engrossed | |
2011-06-14 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-14 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2011-06-14 | Placed On Cal For 6/14/2011 | |
2011-06-14 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-06-14 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-06-10 | Ref To Com On Commerce | |
2011-06-10 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-10 | Rec From House | |
2011-06-08 | Ordered Engrossed | |
2011-06-08 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-08 | Amend Tabled 3 | |
2011-06-08 | Amend Adopted 2 | |
2011-06-08 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2011-06-07 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-06-06 | Placed On Cal For 6/7/2011 | |
2011-06-03 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-03 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2011-05-19 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary Subcommittee A | |
2011-05-19 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-02-07 | Ref to the Com on Government, if favorable, Judiciary Subcommittee A | |
2011-02-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-02-03 | Filed |