NC H347 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Ch. SL 2013-252
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Ch. SL 2013-252
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Greensboro Fire Retirement/Charter
Title
Amend Greensboro Fire Retirement/Charter
Sponsors
Rep. John Faircloth [R] | Rep. Alma Adams [D] | Rep. Jonathan Hardister [R] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] |
Rep. Kenneth Brandon [D] | Rep. Elmer Floyd [D] | Rep. Bobbie Richardson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-09 | Ch. SL 2013-252 | |
2013-07-09 | Ratified | |
2013-07-08 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-07-08 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2013-07-01 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/08/2013 |
2013-07-01 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2013-06-27 | House | Rec To Concur S Com Sub |
2013-06-27 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Pensions & Retirement and Aging |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-05-02 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-02 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-01 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/02/2013 |
2013-05-01 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-05-01 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-04-24 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2013-04-24 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-04-04 | House | Re-ref Com On State Personnel |
2013-04-04 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-03-20 | House | Ref to the Com on Government, if favorable, State Personnel, if favorable, Finance |
2013-03-20 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-19 | House | Filed |